Accounts and annual returns ST MARGARET'S BABINGTON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1038294
Charity reporting is overdue by 975 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 244 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 244 days
Annual return 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 609 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 609 days
Annual return 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 975 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 975 days
Annual return 05 April 2018 22 July 2022 1263 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 22 July 2022 1263 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 26 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 26 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window