FRIENDS OF TRURO LEARNING ACADEMY

Charity number: 1038297
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £2.49k £2.25k £2.04k £2.20k £2.69k
Total expenditure £2.60k £1.64k £1.70k £2.25k £2.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A