Financial history THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF COVENTRY

Charity number: 1038431
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £125.13k £129.38k £106.82k £87.60k £124.83k
Total expenditure £68.16k £116.21k £110.67k £73.88k £113.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £8.99k £6.01k