Accounts and annual returns THE JOANINHA TRUST

Charity number: 1038536
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 30 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 24 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 09 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 24 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 02 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required