THE ELLIOTT SIMMONS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1038541
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £5.72m £10.79k £4.73k £9.39k £10.09k
Total expenditure £2.04m £12.12k £1.80m £729.56k £175.25k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £5.72m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £1.36k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £5.72m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.04m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £8.72k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.04m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A