THE JANET TROTTER TRUST

Charity number: 1038551
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 04 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 04 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 14 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 13 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 13 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 24 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required