THE JANET TROTTER TRUST

Charity number: 1038551
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £23.15k £42.74k £15.21k £32.81k £38.11k
Total expenditure £20.56k £12.76k £22.82k £26.21k £8.47k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A