COLBY VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community activities: WI, Art Group, Textiles Group, Young Farmers Community events: Carol concert, Christmas party, summer barbecue, pub nights, soup and dessert, dominoes drive, quiz nights etc Contribution to local community: picnic bench on village green for Platinum Jubilee, funding of grass cutting to keep village area clean.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 20 June 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Olga Nanette Gannon | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Grace Dangerfield | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Martin-Walker | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
SALLY ISOBEL DRYDEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.16k | £10.59k | £10.57k | £5.28k | £7.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.49k | £1.92k | £10.15k | £8.48k | £6.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £9.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 10 March 2024 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 02 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 8 APRIL 1994
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF BANDLEYSIDE
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF BANBLEYSIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Garth House
Colby
APPLEBY-IN-WESTMORLAND
Cumbria
CA16 6BD
- Phone:
- 07749934101
- Email:
- pmw291154@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window