RAVENFIELD PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1038875
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019
Total gross income £90.09k £90.97k £86.33k £75.32k £72.60k
Total expenditure £82.47k £92.32k £99.99k £89.49k £86.90k
Income from government contracts £65.26k £66.89k £66.38k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A