Financial history WATERHOUSES C E (C) PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1038883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £7.76k £6.96k £4.28k £1.16k £424
Total expenditure £9.57k £5.15k £6.12k £4.21k £277
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A