Financial history ST EDWARD'S CATHOLIC JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1038892
Charity reporting is overdue by 723 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £8.41k £7.42k £6.34k £5.46k £3.80k
Total expenditure £4.65k £8.35k £8.39k £7.50k £2.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A