Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ARDLEY HILL

Charity number: 1038929
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 02 March 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 06 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 June 2022 341 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 05 April 2021 279 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 01 July 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required