Financial history THE DITTONS SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1038983
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £55.43k £48.02k £57.68k £33.74k £72.01k
Total expenditure £39.00k £37.51k £37.44k £47.71k £67.30k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £21.33k £51.91k