Accounts and annual returns ROTARY CLUB OF OXFORD ISIS TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1038992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 02 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 16 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 16 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 06 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 28 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 28 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required