Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF OXFORD ISIS TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1038992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £18.97k £19.08k £15.76k £35.69k £13.92k
Total expenditure £14.01k £26.93k £16.29k £36.36k £19.01k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A