C A T C H U P LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote and encourage people with disabilities to be intergrated into the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 28 June 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mr J Kirkhouse | Trustee | 22 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Mrs M Villers | Trustee | 22 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mrs J Williams | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ARTHUR HUBERT HITCHMAN | Trustee | 25 May 2015 |
|
|||||
Eunydd Brynmor Ashley Thomas | Trustee | 22 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.23k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.31k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £46.69k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 455 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 455 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 NOVEMBER 1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 23 NOVEMBER 1993 AND 19 APRIL 1994
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF DISABLED PERSONS IN THE LLANELLI DISTRICT OF DYFED, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF AN INFORMATION AND ADVICE SERVICE ON MATTERS AFFECTING THEIR DISABILITY.
Area of benefit
LLANELLI DISTRICT OF DYFED
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 PARK VIEW DRIVE
KIDWELLY
SA17 4UP
- Phone:
- 01554891459
- Email:
- info@catchupltd.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window