Dogfen lywodraethu THE INTENSIVE CARE SOCIETY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/06/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/05/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/05/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/12/2012 as amended on 10 Dec 2019 as amended on 08 Dec 2020 as amended on 11 Mar 2021 as amended on 26 Jul 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE CARE AND SAFETY OF CRITICALLY ILL PATIENTS, BY (1) THE ADVANCEMENT AND PROMOTION OF THOSE BRANCHES OF MEDICAL SCIENCE CONCERNED WITH CRITICAL CARE; AND (2) THE PROMOTION OF STUDY AND RESEARCH INTO CRITICAL CARE AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY AND RESEARCH.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.