Trustees THE INTENSIVE CARE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1039236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Andrew Breen Trustee 04 December 2023
None on record
Dr Paul Dean Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Professor Hugh Edward Montgomery Trustee 01 January 2022
THE PHYSIOLOGICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE TOPSY FOUNDATION UK
Overdue by 27 days
Sarah Anderson Trustee 10 December 2019
None on record
Martin Cresswell Trustee 10 December 2019
None on record
Dr Shondipon Kumar Laha Trustee 05 December 2017
None on record
DR Steve Mathieu Trustee 08 December 2015
None on record