ABERTILLERY AND DISTRICT YOUTH BAND

Charity number: 1039267
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.59k £7.27k £10.81k £6.65k £6.38k
Total expenditure £6.14k £8.28k £10.67k £9.39k £2.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A