WILLINGTON OLD SCHOOL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a community centre to provide facilities for social, educational, cultural and recreational activities for the benefit of the people of Willington and the surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 18 July 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BILL HARDING | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ian Hudson | Trustee | 26 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MAURICE LOWRIE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HOWARD RALPH RILEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DONNA LOUISE BARKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.54k | £8.00k | £15.26k | £20.66k | £22.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.10k | £8.50k | £12.31k | £18.88k | £20.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 January 2022 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 December 2020 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23 APRIL 1994 AS AMENDED 17 OCTOBER 1995.
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF WILLINGTON
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WILLINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 St. Michaels Close
Willington
DERBY
DE65 6EB
- Phone:
- 01283704959
- Email:
- eirwol@talktalk.net
- Website:
-
willingtonoldschool.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window