KINGSTON CARERS' NETWORK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SUPPORT CARERS OF PERSONS WHO LIVE IN THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF KINGSTON UPON THAMES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kingston Upon Thames
Governance
- 18 July 1994: Standard registration
- 23 October 2013: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 23 October 2013: Funds transferred to 1151456 KINGSTON CARERS' NETWORK
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £148.38k | £131.33k | £256.16k | £255.82k | £301.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £136.46k | £170.98k | £227.36k | £227.40k | £299.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 21 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 21 October 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 14 November 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 26 November 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 11 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 19 December 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 31 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 31 January 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 30TH JUNE 1994 AS AMENDED ON 9TH JUNE 1998 AND ON 26TH OCTOBER 1999 AND 10 OCTOBER 2001
Charitable objects
THE CARERS' NETWORK IS ESTABLISHED TO ALLEVIATE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE AMONG PEOPLE WHO ARE CARING OR WHO HAVE CARED FOR ELDERLY, SICK, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED OR OTHERWISE INFIRM PERSONS AT HOME WHO ARE RESIDENTS OF THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF KINGSTON UPON THAMES AND WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
ROYAL BOROUGH OF KINGSTON UPON THAMES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window