Financial history HOLY TRINITY PLAYGROUP (ASHBY DE-LA-ZOUCH)

Charity number: 1039542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £109.47k £115.87k £111.06k £145.37k £121.39k
Total expenditure £109.58k £105.42k £103.81k £118.86k £114.19k
Income from government contracts £70.26k £0 N/A £115.05k N/A
Income from government grants £126 £0 N/A N/A £6.30k