Trustees HOLY TRINITY PLAYGROUP (ASHBY DE-LA-ZOUCH)

Charity number: 1039542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Raphael Chair 16 November 2017
None on record
Georgina Claire Cockram Trustee 28 January 2022
None on record
Helen Williams Trustee 04 January 2022
FRIENDS OF HILL TOP
Received: On time
Joanne Lockwood Trustee 04 January 2022
None on record
Louise Bailey Trustee 12 October 2021
None on record
JOANNA FRAPE Trustee 08 October 2020
None on record
CHARLOTTE CONIBEAR Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Jane Newborough Trustee 16 November 2017
None on record