BENGALI WORKERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1039551
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £220.90k £226.94k £179.06k £266.94k £152.41k
Total expenditure £194.30k £228.39k £202.50k £301.59k £188.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £39.73k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £106.98k £70.30k £62.22k £243.30k £129.40k