ACCESS TO COMMUNITY EDUCATION (A.C.E)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDES EDUCATIONAL, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES & THEIR CARERS/HELPERS. THE OBJECT IS TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS. ACE OFFERS CLASSES EACH WEEK, TERM TIME, AT SOUTH DEVON COLLEGE INCLUDING SWIMMING, THURSDAY GROUP SOCIAL MORNING, SPORT MOBILITY AND DRAWING AND PAINTING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Torbay
Governance
- 22 July 1994: Standard registration
- ACE (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT IAN BOYD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
YVONNE RAMOS | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
JEMMA KIM STEPHENS | Trustee | 30 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET EILEEN DODD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.65k | £2.74k | £0 | £0 | £5.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.04k | £1.15k | £2.52k | £5.86k | £7.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2024 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2024 | 731 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 03 March 2022 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 FEBRUARY 1994
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATIONAL RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES AND THEIR CARERS/HELPERS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
South Devon College
CHCP
187 Newton Road
TORQUAY
TQ2 7FT
- Phone:
- 01803540865
- Email:
- info@acetorbay.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window