Accounts and annual returns OLNEY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1039667
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 08 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 20 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 22 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 07 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 07 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 24 July 2018 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 24 July 2018 24 days late Download Open in new window