Financial history OLNEY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1039667
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £108.82k £122.90k £144.41k £133.78k £141.03k
Total expenditure £107.32k £109.46k £117.33k £129.22k £129.95k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A