Accounts and annual returns COMMONWEALTH LEGAL EDUCATION ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1039746
Charity reporting is overdue by 54 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 54 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 54 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 24 July 2023 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 23 May 2023 388 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 23 May 2023 753 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 23 May 2023 1118 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required