Accounts and annual returns BANGLADESH ASSOCIATION GREATER READING

Charity number: 1039747
Charity reporting is up to date (44 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 12 August 2024 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 13 August 2024 44 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 10 January 2024 194 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 10 January 2024 194 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 25 April 2023 299 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 May 2022 329 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 25 May 2022 329 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 March 2021 260 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 17 March 2021 260 days late Download Open in new window