Governing document BANGLADESH ASSOCIATION GREATER READING

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 SEPTEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 23 JUNE 1994, 28 MAY 1995, 22 JULY 1998, 21 JANUARY 2001 AND 18 NOVEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONGST THE BANGLADESHI COMMUNITY IN READING AREA. TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE BANGLADESHI COMMUNITY IN THE READING AREA WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. TO MAKE DONATIONS TO SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTE AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINKS FIT. (SEE CONSTITUTION FOR FULL OBJECTS)
Area of benefit
READING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.