Financial history THE INNER WHEEL CLUB OF KIRKBY-IN-ASHFIELD NOTTINGHAM

Charity number: 1039837
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/07/2017 01/07/2018 01/07/2019 01/07/2020 01/07/2021
Total gross income £1.72k £2.06k £3.07k £3.71k £3.22k
Total expenditure £1.58k £1.74k £2.95k £3.13k £2.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A