HARROLD PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1039965
Charity reporting is up to date (37 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 August 2021 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 06 August 2021 37 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 August 2020 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 23 August 2020 54 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 24 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 24 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 30 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 06 October 2017 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 06 October 2017 98 days late Download