Accounts and annual returns LEICESTERSHIRE LIFE EDUCATION CENTRES TRUST COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 1040007
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 28 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 26 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 29 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 27 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 27 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 29 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 29 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 25 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 26 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window