NORTH WEST LANCASHIRE & CUMBRIA IA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help anyone whose colon has been, or is about to be, removed by surgical procedure or who has an ileostomy. To promote and co-ordinate research into bowel disease and other conditions leading to the removal of the colon. To keep ileostomists and others informed of all matters of interest to the Charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
Governance
- 08 August 1994: Standard registration
- 05 December 2018: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 05 December 2018: Funds transferred to 1172338 ILEOSTOMY AND INTERNAL POUCH ASSOCIATION
- IA CENTRAL AND NORTH LANCASHIRE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.88k | £4.00k | £3.60k | £2.74k | £2.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.68k | £3.47k | £3.02k | £1.62k | £1.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 29 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 25 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | 10 November 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | 22 February 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/04/1994 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 27/03/2010 AS AMENDED ON 11/04/2015
Charitable objects
TO HELP ANYONE LIVING IN THE CENTRAL AND NORTH LANCASHIRE AREA AND ELSEWHERE WHOSE COLON HAS BEEN, OR IS ABOUT TO BE REMOVED OR WHO HAS AN ILEOSTOMY. B. TO PROMOTE AND CO-ORDINATE RESEARCH INTO BOWEL DISEASE AND OTHER RELATED MATTERS AND FURTHER TO PROMOTE THE DISSEMINATION OF KNOWLEDGE GAINED BY SUCH RESEARCH. C. TO KEEP ILEOSTOMISTS AND OTHERS INFORMED OF ALL MATTERS OF INTEREST TO THE ASSOCIATION BY THE DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION BY ARRANGING CONFERENCES, SEMINARS AND COURSES.
Area of benefit
CENTRAL AND NORTH LANCASHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window