PALESTINIANS RELIEF AND DEVELOPMENT FUND

Charity number: 1040094
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £6.16m £6.08m £5.91m £7.04m £5.54m
Total expenditure £6.92m £7.80m £6.07m £6.47m £6.20m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £6.09m £6.04m £5.87m £6.94m £5.47m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £66.86k £27.05k £38.94k £92.16k £64.08k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.75k £5.56k £440 £653 £6.16k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.41m £7.23m £5.37m £5.87m £5.73m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £566.81k £703.06k £602.37k £462.21k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £27.57k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0