Accounts and annual returns SOUTH HYLTON PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1040111
Charity reporting is overdue by 585 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 220 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 220 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 585 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 585 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 08 January 2020 192 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 04 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required