Financial history SOUTH HYLTON PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1040111
Charity reporting is overdue by 584 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £553 £788 £9.23k £1.72k £1.05k
Total expenditure £633 £701 £8.52k £1.39k £729
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A