RAMANA MAHARSHI FOUNDATION U.K.

Charity number: 1040280
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHRISTOPHER JOHN HOPKINSON Trustee 29 January 2014 None on record
SHALINI SINHA Trustee None on record
Gurudas Bailur Trustee 15 March 2019 None on record
Zarine Pegler Trustee 18 May 2018 None on record
BARRY RICHARD DOMEGAN Trustee None on record
Christopher Richard Pegler Trustee 05 May 2017 None on record
ALASDAIR MURRAY FORBES BLACK Chair None on record
Simon Dicon Montford Trustee 21 September 2020 None on record