Governing document Christian Science Society, Exeter
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND BY-LAWS ADOPTED 1938 AS AMENDED 11 JULY 1994, 12 JULY 2004, 10 JANUARY 2005 AND 11 OCTOBER 2010 AS AMENDED ON 05 FEB 2017 as amended on 22 May 2023 as amended on 02 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF THIS CHURCH IS TO BEAR WITNESS TO THE TRUTH AS SET FORTH IN THE BIBLE AND INTERPRETED SPIRITUALLY IN "SCIENCE AND HEALTH WITH KEY TO THE SCRIPTURES" BY MARY BAKER EDDY, THE DISCOVERER AND FOUNDER OF CHRISTIAN SCIENCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE EXETER
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.