TYLERS GREEN FIRST SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Develop extended relationships between staff, parents and others associated with the school and engage in activities which support the school and advance the education of pupils attending it.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 26 August 1994: Standard registration
- TYLERS GREEN COUNTY FIRST SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Esther Pilgerstorfer | Chair | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Neil Andrews | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Worsley | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.93k | £15.49k | £9.77k | £23.21k | £20.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.69k | £27.24k | £2.42k | £28.51k | £7.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 July 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 January 2024 | 198 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 March 2023 | 252 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 February 2023 | 582 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 July 2020 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 27 July 2020 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 6 JUNE 1994 AS AMENDED 20 OCTOBER 2000.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tylers Green First School
School Road
Penn
High Wycombe
HP10 8EF
- Phone:
- 01494 813 201
- Email:
- tgfs.pta@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window