ST JOHNS PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (CARLTON)

Charity number: 1040402
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 08 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 08 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 08 February 2021 253 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 08 February 2021 253 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 08 February 2021 619 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 08 February 2021 619 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 06 October 2018 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 16 October 2018 138 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 23 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 23 May 2017 On time Download