Accounts and annual returns BORDER PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1040403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 25 June 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 25 June 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 06 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 06 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 11 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 05 July 2020 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 05 July 2020 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 20 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 20 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window