Accounts and annual returns THE CHARITIES ADVISORY TRUST

Charity number: 1040487
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 30 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 01 May 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 24 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 24 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 29 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 01 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 30 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 04 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 27 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 25 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window