Financial history THE CHARITIES ADVISORY TRUST

Charity number: 1040487
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £892.56k £921.25k £840.36k £901.22k £608.84k
Total expenditure £1.01m £904.22k £970.24k £943.02k £725.07k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £673.99k £731.72k £651.73k £753.09k £539.49k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £170.90k £104.80k £44.43k
Income - Charitable activities £184.89k £156.80k £0 £27.77k £12.76k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.10k £15.71k £17.74k £15.55k £12.16k
Income - Other £31.58k £17.02k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £886.36k £784.81k £434.28k £779.39k £542.65k
Expenditure - Raising funds £121.02k £119.41k £163.13k £163.63k £182.42k
Expenditure - Governance £18.90k £13.12k £6.05k £6.25k £7.65k
Expenditure - Grants institution £496.17k £379.79k £416.07k £384.29k £292.84k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £372.83k £0 £0