Financial history FORUM FOR THE FUTURE

Charity number: 1040519
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £5.27m £5.33m £5.99m £5.81m £5.13m
Total expenditure £5.10m £5.27m £5.42m £5.39m £5.39m
Income from government contracts £80.00k N/A N/A £1.12k N/A
Income from government grants £173.00k £17.00k £51.15k £152.14k £15.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £170.00k £130.00k £158.00k £451.00k £170.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £5.10m £5.20m £5.83m £5.36m £4.96m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.06m £5.17m £5.26m £5.20m £5.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds £41.00k £99.00k £168.00k £195.00k £290.00k
Expenditure - Governance £33.00k £56.00k £61.00k £59.00k £45.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0