Accounts and annual returns THE GERTRUDE GOURVITCH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1040531
Charity reporting is overdue by 249 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 249 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 249 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 February 2021 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 26 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 14 February 2018 14 days late Download Open in new window