Financial history THE GERTRUDE GOURVITCH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1040531
Charity reporting is overdue by 240 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £11.88k £42.00k £23.42k £23.91k £14.23k
Total expenditure £30.30k £15.12k £17.53k £19.42k £22.27k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A