Trustees THE FRIENDS OF THE CONNECTION AT ST. MARTIN-IN-THE-FIELDS
Charity number: 1040560
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Woodd | Chair | 04 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Matthew David Whalley | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Keane | Trustee | 13 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alex Gandini | Trustee | 13 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emily Cecil-Dennett | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mr Chris Riley | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA MARY BATCHELOR | Trustee | 26 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET BEELS | Trustee | 12 March 2007 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.