Dogfen lywodraethu THE GREATER MANCHESTER HIGH SHERIFF'S POLICE TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2 SEPTEMBER 1994 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 28 SEPTEMBER 1995 AND 11 OCTOBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 07 NOV 2016 as amended on 28 Feb 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN AND AROUND THE GREATER MANCHESTER AREA A SAFER AND INCREASED QUALITY OF LIFE THROUGH THE PREVENTION OF CRIME AND THE PROTECTION OF PEOPLE AND PROPERTY FROM CRIMINAL ACTS; AND (B) TO SECURE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO ALCOHOL, DRUG AND OTHER SOLVENT ABUSE
Maes buddion
IN AND AROUND THE GREATER MANCHESTER AREA
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.