NMA MONEY ADVICE

Charity Number: 1040623
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2008

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 September 1994: Standard registration
  • 04 August 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/07/2005 31/07/2006 31/07/2007 31/07/2008
Total gross income £491.24k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £492.37k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2005 28 February 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2005 05 October 2006 127 days late
Annual return 31 March 2004 31 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 31 January 2005 On Time